This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 03:32:35 (UTC).

CASTELLANOS, KARINA VS ARREDONDO, SIMON

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 CASTELLANOS, KARINA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ARREDONDO, SIMON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LOPEZ-GISS, SUSAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4628

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LOPEZ-GISS, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CASTELLANOS KARINA

Respondent

ARREDONDO SIMON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEVINSON MARK LYNN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • PACE - Declaration and Order Re: Fees (2/11/18 TO 4/13/18 - $262.50 - AMIR PICHVAI ); Filed by Child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F46, Lopez-Giss, Susan, Presiding; Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F46, Lopez-Giss, Susan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Judgment - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Dissomaster Printout

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Declaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Castellanos, Karina ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Declaration (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Castellanos, Karina ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Declaration (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Castellanos, Karina ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Ex Parte - Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Castellanos, Karina ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Castellanos, Karina ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINSON MARK LYNN