This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 04:37:50 (UTC).

CARLOS CENICEROS VS. MARIA CENICEROS

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 CARLOS CENICEROS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARIA CENICEROS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1469

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CENICEROS CARLOS

Respondent

CENICEROS MARIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Notice - Rejection (judgment package submitted 6.27.18 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (1st amended ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (1st amended ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2017
  • Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Proof of Service (Personal - On Behalf of: Respondent: Ceniceros, Maria - Service Date on 2017-03-30 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 05-18-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Ceniceros, Maria ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ceniceros, Carlos ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 03-09-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ceniceros, Carlos ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ceniceros, Carlos ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less