This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 05:05:26 (UTC).

BERTRAM BEST JR VS CARMEN DELGADO BEST

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 BERTRAM BEST JR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CARMEN DELGADO BEST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4733

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BEST BERTRAM

BEST BERTRAM JR

Respondent

BEST CARMEN DELGADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PRICHARD DONALD LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons (Respondent's name does not match & Inc. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (No original submitted & POS/NOAR not valid ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition (Petitioner signed as sender ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (POS DEFECTIVE PETITIONER'S NAME DONT MATCH THE PETITION ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 2A, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Held - FCCR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Best, Bertram ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Best, Bertram ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRICHARD DONALD LEE