This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2020 at 14:00:58 (UTC).

2305 THIRTY-FIRST INVESTMENTS,LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, VS UNLIMITED CONCEPTS & DEVELOPMENT,INC.,A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 2305 THIRTY-FIRST INVESTMENTS,LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against UNLIMITED CONCEPTS DEVELOPMENT,INC ,A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0207

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

2305 THIRTY-FIRST INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Respondent

UNLIMITED CONCEPTS & DEVELOPMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KERNS BENNETT

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/28/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

9/4/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Hearing on Petition

7/6/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/26/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien

6/26/2020: Petition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/26/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/26/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by 2305 THIRTY-FIRST INVESTMENTS,LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by 2305 THIRTY-FIRST INVESTMENTS,LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by 2305 THIRTY-FIRST INVESTMENTS,LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 2305 THIRTY-FIRST INVESTMENTS,LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketPetition to Release Property - Mechanic's Lien; Filed by 2305 THIRTY-FIRST INVESTMENTS,LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 2305 THIRTY-FIRST INVESTMENTS,LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNLIMTED CONCEPTS & DEVELOPMENT INC. is a litigant