This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2022 at 01:06:00 (UTC).

2210 SANTA ANA OPCO LLC VS ATHENA HOSPICE & PALLIATIVE CARE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ATHENA HOSPICE PALLIATIVE CARE, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0372

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2210 SANTA ANA OPCO LLC DBA ADVANCED REHAB CENTER OF TUSTIN

Defendants

ATHENA HOSPICE & PALLIATIVE CARE INC.

SUKIASYAN RUBEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GHADOOSHAHY ARASH

KAY NOAH C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/15/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

4/5/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

4/5/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less