This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 10:04:48 (UTC).

21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES and KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6291

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AGENT ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

CATLIN INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

NATIONWIDE AGRIBUSINESS INSURANCE - NAIC

NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY

MIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION

FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN

EXACT PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

ALLIED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY A NATIONWIDE COMPANY

INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

INSURANCE EXCHANGE

NEIGHBORHOOD SPIRIT PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY

CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY

COAST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

WAWANESA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMON CRAIG SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

8/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/25/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULINGS RE: APRIL 14, 2021 INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/15/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULINGS RE: APRIL 14, 2021 INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Appearance

4/15/2021: Notice of Appearance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/1/2021: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

4/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

3/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Initial Status Conference Order

3/9/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;) OF 03/09/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

3/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;) OF 03/09/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

3/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/23/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Related Case

3/23/2021: Notice of Related Case

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

2/22/2021: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/17/2021: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • Hearing11/03/2021 at 2:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDefendant Southern California Edison Company's Answer to Complaint; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rulings Re: April 14, 2021 Initial Status Conference; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Setting Initial Status Conference;) of 03/09/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docketat 10:58 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 03/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint for Damages; Filed by 21st Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Civic Property & Casualty Company (Plaintiff); Coast National Insurance Company (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 21st Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 21st Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Civic Property & Casualty Company (Plaintiff); Coast National Insurance Company (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 21st Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Civic Property & Casualty Company (Plaintiff); Coast National Insurance Company (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INSURANCE EXCHANGE is a litigant

Latest cases where AGENT ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CATLIN INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant