This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 19:35:17 (UTC).

20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. VS PACIFICORE CONSTRUCTION, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 20/20 PLUMBING HEATING, INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against PACIFICORE CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3502

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING INC.

Defendants

PACIFICORE CONSTRUCTION INC

MIDFIRST BANK

1449 WELLESLEY AVE. LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PICOZZI EDWARD M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/28/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by 20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFICORE CONSTRUCTION INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Midfirst Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PICOZZI, EDWARD M