This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2021 at 22:29:22 (UTC).

20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. VS ALPHA CONSTRUCTION CO., INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 20/20 PLUMBING HEATING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALPHA CONSTRUCTION CO , INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9495

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING INC.

Defendants

ALPHA CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.

CITIBANK N.A. ISAOA

RISE HOUSING LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PICOZZI ED

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/10/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/12/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • Hearing01/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Hearing01/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ALPHA CONSTRUCTION CO. INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PICOZZI ED