This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2021 at 17:23:39 (UTC).

20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. VS ALPHA CONSTRUCTION CO., INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 20/20 PLUMBING HEATING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALPHA CONSTRUCTION CO , INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9487

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING INC.

Defendants

ALPHA CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.

CITIBANK N.A. ISAOA

RISE HOUSING LP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PICOZZI ED

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/10/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by 20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ALPHA CONSTRUCTION CO. INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PICOZZI ED