Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2019 at 01:27:57 (UTC).

1ST CENTURY BANK VS THIRD WAY TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2018 1ST CENTURY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THIRD WAY TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8764

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1ST CENTURY BANK

Defendants

THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES INC.

WROAN DAVID S.

MARCATO JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THOMPSON COBURN LLP

NOVIAN & NOVIAN

Defendant Attorney

HUMPHREY J. SCOTT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Case Previously Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to this date & continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (With prejudice Complaint ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by 1ST CENTURY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Notice of Continuance; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Answer to Complaint Filed (ON BEHALF OF: JOHN MARCATO ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Answer; Filed by JOHN MARCATO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by 1ST CENTURY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by 1ST CENTURY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by 1ST CENTURY BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where 1ST CENTURY BANK is a litigant