This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2021 at 14:26:40 (UTC).

1875/1925 CENTURY PARK EAST COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP VS NEW ACT TRAVEL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 1875/1925 CENTURY PARK EAST COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEW ACT TRAVEL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1952

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1875/1925 CENTURY PARK EAST COMPANY A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

NEW ACT TRAVEL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITMAN TODD E.

Defendant Attorney

BECK PAUL ALAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/16/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/12/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/27/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer

6/3/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

6/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • Hearing02/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by New Act Travel, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by 1875/1925 Century Park East Company, a California general partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by New Act Travel, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by 1875/1925 Century Park East Company, a California general partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by 1875/1925 Century Park East Company, a California general partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by 1875/1925 Century Park East Company, a California general partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 1875/1925 Century Park East Company, a California general partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 1875/1925 Century Park East Company, a California general partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 1875/1925 Century Park East Company, a California general partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1875/1925 CENTURY PARK EAST COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITMAN TODD E.