This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2020 at 13:03:31 (UTC).

155 WASHINGTON, LLC VS OLE STATHAM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 155 WASHINGTON, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against OLE STATHAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8805

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

155 WASHINGTON LLC

Defendants

STATHAM OLE

SKYSUPERPOSTERS LLC

PMG LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOLNICK ROBERT M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (SKYSUPERPOSTERS, LLC)

3/6/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (SKYSUPERPOSTERS, LLC)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (PMG, LLC)

3/6/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (PMG, LLC)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (OLE STATHAM)

3/6/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (OLE STATHAM)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

3/6/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/4/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/10/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Application for Order to Post

5/5/2020: Application for Order to Post

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE) OF 05/01/2020

5/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE) OF 05/01/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)

5/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...)

9/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...) OF 09/30/2020

9/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO ...) OF 09/30/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 09/03/2020

9/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 09/03/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

9/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Plaintiff's Failure to Appear) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Plaintiff's Failure to ...) of 09/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Plaintiff's Failure to ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 58; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of 09/03/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Filed by 155 Washington, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((SKYSUPERPOSTERS, LLC)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((PMG, LLC)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Ole Statham)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 155 Washington, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 155 Washington, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 155 Washington, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 155 WASHINGTON LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOLNICK ROBERT MARTIN