This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 10:42:51 (UTC).

1424 S BENTLEY LLC VS FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 1424 S BENTLEY LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0700

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1424 S BENTLEY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A CALIFORNIA INTER-INSURANCE COMPANY

PARAMOUNT EXCLUSIVE INSURANCE SERVICES INC.

KOHEN NATALIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HESS MATTHEW

HESS MATTHEW E. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

HYMAN ANDREW WILLIAM

SCHER GREGORY B.

 

Court Documents

Answer

6/15/2021: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

6/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Summons - SUMMONS FIRST AMENDED

4/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS FIRST AMENDED

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

2/3/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

6/1/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Case Management Statement

2/26/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/26/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

3/3/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

1/15/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/19/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/2/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/12/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/12/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/12/2019: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • Hearing03/09/2022 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Hearing02/25/2022 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Paramount Exclusive Insurance Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension); Filed by Paramount Exclusive Insurance Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (FIRST AMENDED); Filed by 1424 S Bentley LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Jury Trial ((3 days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by 1424 S Bentley LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by 1424 S Bentley LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE TRIAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON); Filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange, a California inter-insurance company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by 1424 S Bentley LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange, a California inter-insurance company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange, a California inter-insurance company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange, a California inter-insurance company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by 1424 S Bentley LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 1424 S Bentley LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 1424 S Bentley LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 1424 S Bentley LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARAMOUNT EXCLUSIVE INSURANCE SERVICES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HYMAN, ANDREW W.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHER GREGORY B. ESQ.