This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 03:35:54 (UTC).

1237 3RD STREET PROMENADE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS AISATOU, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 1237 3RD STREET PROMENADE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AISATOU, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1761

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

1237 3RD STREET PROMENADE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

1237 3RD STREET PROMENADE LLC

AISATOU LLC

BURGERIM GROUP USA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JACKSON LYNNAE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

AISATOU LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AISATOU LLC

BURGERIM GROUP USA INC.

JACKSON LYNNAE

YERMAIN JALEH

YERMAIN MANOUCHER

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

YERMAIN JALEH

YERMAIN MANOUCHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

NACHIMSON BENJAMIN SETH

ARMAS ANDREI

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ARMAS ANDREI

Other Attorneys

WHITMAN SCOTT L

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

11/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREI ARMAS IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' CROSS-COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

7/29/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREI ARMAS IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' CROSS-COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Opposition - CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/29/2021: Opposition - CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' CROSS-COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION OF CROSS-COMPLAINANTS TO DEMURRER TO PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT 1237 3RD STREET PROMENADE, LLC

8/4/2021: Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION OF CROSS-COMPLAINANTS TO DEMURRER TO PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT 1237 3RD STREET PROMENADE, LLC

Objection - OBJECTION 1237 3RD STREET PROMENADE, LLC'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DECLARATION OF ANDREI ARMAS AND CERTAIN EXHIBITS ATTACHED THERETO

8/4/2021: Objection - OBJECTION 1237 3RD STREET PROMENADE, LLC'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DECLARATION OF ANDREI ARMAS AND CERTAIN EXHIBITS ATTACHED THERETO

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER TO PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER TO PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

8/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Answer

9/8/2021: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SCOTT L. WHITMAN RE STATUS REPORT IN PREPARATION FOR SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE

3/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SCOTT L. WHITMAN RE STATUS REPORT IN PREPARATION FOR SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/19/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF STIPULATION AUTHORIZING THE FILING OF A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND COURT APPROVAL THEREOF

3/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF STIPULATION AUTHORIZING THE FILING OF A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND COURT APPROVAL THEREOF

Proof of Personal Service

3/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BURGERIM GROUP USA, INC. BY DELIVERY TO SECRETARY OF STATE, ETC.

4/1/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BURGERIM GROUP USA, INC. BY DELIVERY TO SECRETARY OF STATE, ETC.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SERVICE ON DEFE...)

4/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SERVICE ON DEFE...)

Notice of Ruling

4/6/2021: Notice of Ruling

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 10:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Manoucher Yermain (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 1237 3rd Street Promenade, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Ruling on Demurrer to Portions of Cross-Complaint); Filed by 1237 3rd Street Promenade, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketReply (Reply to Opposition of Cross-Complainants to Demurrer to Portions of Cross-Complaint by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant 1237 3rd Street Promenade, LLC); Filed by 1237 3rd Street Promenade, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketObjection (1237 3rd Street Promenade, LLC's Evidentiary Objections and Motion to Strike Portions of Declaration of Andrei Armas and Certain Exhibits Attached Thereto); Filed by 1237 3rd Street Promenade, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ANDREI ARMAS IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' CROSS-COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER; Filed by Jaleh Yermain (Cross-Complainant); Manoucher Yermain (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Aisatou, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by 1237 3rd Street Promenade, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by 1237 3rd Street Promenade, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Aisatou, LLC, a California limited liability company)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 1237 3rd Street Promenade, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 1237 3rd Street Promenade, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 1237 3rd Street Promenade, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Burgerim Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITMAN SCOTT L