This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 12:53:43 (UTC).

1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS STATE FARM INSURANCE, A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 1217 N MCCADDEN PLACE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM INSURANCE, A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1027

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

HOLLANDER AN INDIVIDUAL BARRI LYNN

HOLLANDER INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STATE FARM INSURANCE A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABRAMSON MICHAEL ALAN

Defendant Attorney

BATEZEL MATTHEW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • Hearing12/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (erroneously sued as ?STATE FARM INSURANCE?) Erroneously Sued As State Farm Insurance, a Business Entity form Unknown (Defendant); Hollander Insurance and Financial Services, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by 1217 N. McCadden Place, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 1217 N. McCadden Place, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 1217 N. McCadden Place, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 1217 N. McCadden Place, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BATEZEL MATTHEW