This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2020 at 00:34:57 (UTC).

11906 SAN VICENTE, LLC VS CYCLE HOUSE, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 11906 SAN VICENTE, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against CYCLE HOUSE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1234

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

11906 SAN VICENTE LLC

Defendant

CYCLE HOUSE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SZKOLNIK FRED M.

 

Court Documents

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

7/10/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint

7/10/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/10/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/10/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/10/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/19/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

7/16/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (CYCLE HOUSE, LLC)

7/16/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (CYCLE HOUSE, LLC)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/4/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/8/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • Hearing01/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference); Filed by 11906 SAN VICENTE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by 11906 SAN VICENTE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((CYCLE HOUSE, LLC)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 11906 SAN VICENTE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 11906 SAN VICENTE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 11906 SAN VICENTE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less