This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 17:15:49 (UTC).

1880 S. BEVERLY DR., LLC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS MORAD GOLCHEH

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 1880 S BEVERLY DR , LLC , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MORAD GOLCHEH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0847

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

1180 S. BEVERLY DR. LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

1880 S. BEVERLY DR. LLC.

Defendant

GOLCHEH MORAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BISNO ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/25/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice - NOTICE ERATTA

8/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE ERATTA

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/20/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • Hearing03/15/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Hearing03/15/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (Eratta); Filed by 1880 S. Beverly Dr., LLC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by 1880 S. Beverly Dr., LLC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 1880 S. Beverly Dr., LLC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by 1880 S. Beverly Dr., LLC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1180 S. BEVERLY DR. SUITE 501 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BISNO ROBERT