This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 14:24:14 (UTC).

1100 WILSHIRE COMMERCIAL LLC VS 1100 WILSHIRE PROPERTY OWNER

Case Summary

On 06/13/2017 1100 WILSHIRE COMMERCIAL LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 1100 WILSHIRE PROPERTY OWNER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOWARD L. HALM and ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4810

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOWARD L. HALM

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

1100 WILSHIRE COMMERCIAL LLC

Respondents and Defendants

1100 WILSHIRE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ROSTAMAIAN SAUL S.

ECOFF LAWRENCE C. ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

COHON JEFFREY M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT 1100 WILSHIRE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

2/13/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT 1100 WILSHIRE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER (1) SENDING THE MATTER TO A SETTLEMENT JUDGE IN DEP?T 18; AND; ETC.

3/29/2018: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER (1) SENDING THE MATTER TO A SETTLEMENT JUDGE IN DEP?T 18; AND; ETC.

PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER (1) SENDING THE MATTER TO A SETTLEMENT JUDGE INDEP'T 18; AND; ETC.

3/29/2018: PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER (1) SENDING THE MATTER TO A SETTLEMENT JUDGE INDEP'T 18; AND; ETC.

Minute Order

3/29/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

4/23/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Minute Order

4/27/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

8/23/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

9/4/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

9/10/2018: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

ORDER GRANTING JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL DATE

9/26/2018: ORDER GRANTING JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL DATE

Minute Order

9/26/2018: Minute Order

JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL DATE

9/26/2018: JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL DATE

NOTICE OF RULING RE JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE

9/27/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/5/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Substitution of Attorney

1/23/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Unknown

1/29/2019: Unknown

Opposition

3/22/2019: Opposition

Reply

3/28/2019: Reply

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by 1100 Wilshire Property OWNERS Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • at 4:32 PM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • at 2:33 PM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC);)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2017
  • DECLARATION OF HENRY NICHOLLS RE COMPLIANCE WITH CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41(A)(3) IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT 1100 WILSHIRE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by 1100 Wilshire Commercial LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; 2. INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL RELATIONS; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1100 WILSHIRE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSTAMAIAN SAUL S.