This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2023 at 04:02:25 (UTC).

1022 S. LA CIENEGA MANAGER, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS AIDA RENTA-CALIB, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 1022 S LA CIENEGA MANAGER, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against AIDA RENTA-CALIB,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS J. LANDIN, LAWRENCE P. RIFF and ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0834

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DENNIS J. LANDIN

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

1022 S. LA CIENEGA MANAGER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA V LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

123 HOLDINGS LLC

ABRAMSON TRUSTEE OF THE ABRAMSON FAMILY TRUST BRUCE

AINBINDER TRUSTEE OF THE AINBINDER FAMILY TRUST DENNIS J.

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR OTHER INTEREST OF ANY TYPE OR NATURE WHATSOEVER IN AND/OR TO ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA V LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ITS PROPERTY OR ASSETS

ASHTON TRUSTEE OF THE ASHTON FAMILY TRUST WILLIAM

ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA V LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BADEN RONALD

BADEN SCOTT

BADEN SHAUN

BALAKRISHNAN ROBERT

BALTES TRUSTEE OF THE BALTES TRUST DAVID

BOTWIN TRUSTEE OF THE RONALD BOTWIN 75 TRUST RONALD

BRODSKY JOEL

CA ORTH DEF BEN PLAN/VOGEL

COPPELSON AARON

DE MIRANDA JAY R.

DIDM DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

76 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PETROVSKY LISA

ROWEN ERIC V.

Defendant Attorneys

DEMASON MICHELLE R.

EGHBALI DORON

SEUTHE ERIC B

SHELDON RICHARD B.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

2/25/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Case Management Statement

2/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/28/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

1/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

1/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

1/21/2022: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

1/21/2022: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

1/21/2022: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/21/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

1/21/2022: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

1/21/2022: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

1/19/2022: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

1/14/2022: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

154 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Bankruptcy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51 updated: Result Date to 02/28/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNotice OF REMOTE APPEARANCE; Filed by: Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP (Defendant); As to: 1022 S. LA CIENEGA MANAGER, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: KEVIN TAGUCHI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: CHARLES WEBER (Defendant); TIMOTHY MCADAM (Defendant); San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Company (Doe 5) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: JACOB TAUBER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
196 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketAddress for Eric V. Rowen (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/03/2021 at 09:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/03/2021 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael L. Stern in Department 62 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: 1022 S. LA CIENEGA MANAGER, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: AIDA RENTA-CALIB (Defendant); BRUCE ABRAMSON, TRUSTEE OF THE ABRAMSON FAMILY TRUST (Defendant); DENNIS J. AINBINDER, TRUSTEE OF THE AINBINDER FAMILY TRUST (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: 1022 S. LA CIENEGA MANAGER, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: AIDA RENTA-CALIB (Defendant); BRUCE ABRAMSON, TRUSTEE OF THE ABRAMSON FAMILY TRUST (Defendant); DENNIS J. AINBINDER, TRUSTEE OF THE AINBINDER FAMILY TRUST (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: 1022 S. LA CIENEGA MANAGER, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: AIDA RENTA-CALIB (Defendant); BRUCE ABRAMSON, TRUSTEE OF THE ABRAMSON FAMILY TRUST (Defendant); DENNIS J. AINBINDER, TRUSTEE OF THE AINBINDER FAMILY TRUST (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less