Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2020 at 17:14:52 (UTC).

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY VS. A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO.

Case Summary

On 09/25/2006 ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK S. ARNOLD, RAMONA G. SEE, WILLIAM G. WILLETT and CARY NISHIMOTO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3924

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK S. ARNOLD

RAMONA G. SEE

WILLIAM G. WILLETT

CARY NISHIMOTO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WHITE ERNESTINE

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO. INC.

EKBERG CRAIG (DOE 28)

EKBERG CRAIG - DOE 4

MIGLIAZZO BEVERLY J. DOE 27

MIGLIAZZO VINCENT A. DOE 26

NGUYEN TRUC TRUNG (DOE 2)

ROES 1 TO 30 INCLUSIVE

THE MIGLIAZZO TRUST DOE 1

EKBERG CRAIG DOE 28

NGUYEN TRUC TRUNG DOE 2

DANNY'S CONSTRUCTION INC.

TRANG DAVID DOE 3

Cross Defendants

BEHAVORIAL HEALTH SERVICES INC. A CA CORP

COLDMAN REFRIGERATION SERVICE - ROE 2

MIGLIAZZO VINCENT A. DOE 26

NGUYEN TRUC TRUNG - ROE 1

THE MIGLIAZZO TRUST DOE 1

TRANG DAVID QUANG INDIVIDUALLY & DBA

Other

VAN GINKEL ERIC

Not Classified By Court

ROTHMAN DEBORAH

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SKINNER WARD D.

MEISSNER WERNER R.

Defendant Attorneys

GRAY DUFFY LLP

LEAR SHERRY ANNE

TRAN TOBY LAW OFFICES OF

GAGLIONE & DOLAN

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL

12/3/2008: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL

12/3/2008: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL

12/4/2008: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL

12/4/2008: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL

12/5/2008: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL

12/5/2008: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2008-12-08 00:00:00

12/8/2008: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2008-12-08 00:00:00

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2008
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO.,INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2008
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO.,INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; (Court's Order to Show Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2008
  • DocketPartial Dismissal; Filed by COLDMAN REFRIGERATION SERVICE - ROE 2 (Cross-Defendant); TRANG, DAVID QUANG,INDIVIDUALLY & DBA (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2008
  • DocketPartial Dismissal; Filed by COLDMAN REFRIGERATION SERVICE - ROE 2 (Cross-Defendant); TRANG, DAVID QUANG,INDIVIDUALLY & DBA (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2008
  • DocketPartial Dismissal; Filed by NGUYEN, TRUC TRUNG - ROE 1 (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • DocketPartial Dismissal; Filed by MIGLIAZZO, BEVERLY J., DOE 27 (Legacy Party); MIGLIAZZO, VINCENT A., DOE 26 (Legacy Party); THE MIGLIAZZO TRUST, DOE 1 (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • DocketPartial Dismissal; Filed by ERNESTINE WHITE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2008
  • DocketPartial Dismissal; Filed by A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO.,INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
158 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E; (Court's Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2006
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2006
  • DocketAmended Notice; Filed by ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2006
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2006
  • DocketNotice; Filed by ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2006
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2006
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2006
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); ERNESTINE WHITE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2006
  • DocketSummons; Filed by ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING WEST LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases where BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Danny's Construction Company, LLC, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant