Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2020 at 19:06:54 (UTC).

WARMINGTON OCEAN FRONT ASSOC. LP VS. ALBERT MEYLING ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2006 WARMINGTON OCEAN FRONT ASSOC LP filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against ALBERT MEYLING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL P. VICENCIA and CARY NISHIMOTO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4347

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

CARY NISHIMOTO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WARMINGTON HOMES CALIFORNIA A CORP.

WARMINGTON OCEAN FRONT ASSOCIATES LP.

Defendants

ANAHEIM DOOR INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP.

BEMUS LANDSCAPE INC. A CALIF. CORP.

BUILDERS TRIM & DOOR A CALIFORNIA CORP.

CALIFORNIA BUILDING SPECIALTIES INC.

CDR CONCRETE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP.

CONSTRUCTION SERVICES A BUSINESS ENTITY

DAVEY ROOFING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP.

FORD FRAMING COMPANY INC. CALIF. CORP.

FORD TILE INC.

GOLDEN WEST PLUMBING INC. A CALIF. CORP

J.W.E. CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JOHN L. GINGER MASONRY INC. A

L.A.R.K. INDUSTRIES INC. A CALIF CORP.

L.I. METAL SYSTEMS A CALIFORNIA CORP.

MEYLING ALBERT DBA ALM PAINTING

PACIFIC SHORES MASONARY INC. A

PACIFICA SHEET METAL BUSINESS ENTITY OF

Cross Defendant

MOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COOKSEY TOOLEYN GAGE DUFFY & WOOG

WINSBERG ALEXANDER T.

Defendant Attorneys

LYNCH GREGORY G.

NIEVES OMEL A.

EDIC WILLIAM S.

HEALY ANNE MARIE

HAUSMAN DONALD L.

HARRIS CHARLES L.

WESIERSKI & ZUREK LLP

BRAASCH DEBRA L.

KHUONG QUYEN H.

KIRKPATRICK CHERYL A.

LYON DAVID P.

LEE BAZZO & NISHI LLP

THOMAS WAYNE D.

PADEN SEAN P.

MENDES PATRICK J.

PEGAN KEVIN LAW OFFICES OF

CHIN ARCHIE

GRANT TIMOTHY J.

3 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2010
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E; (Court's Order to Show Cause; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by PETERSON BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by WARMINGTON OCEAN FRONT ASSOCIATES, LP. (Plaintiff); WARMINGTON HOMES CALIFORNIA, A CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E; (Motion Hearing; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by WARMINGTON OCEAN FRONT ASSOCIATES, LP. (Plaintiff); WARMINGTON HOMES CALIFORNIA, A CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by WARMINGTON OCEAN FRONT ASSOCIATES, LP. (Plaintiff); WARMINGTON HOMES CALIFORNIA, A CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by WARMINGTON OCEAN FRONT ASSOCIATES, LP. (Plaintiff); WARMINGTON HOMES CALIFORNIA, A CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by WARMINGTON OCEAN FRONT ASSOCIATES, LP. (Plaintiff); WARMINGTON HOMES CALIFORNIA, A CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
313 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2007
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by WARMINGTON OCEAN FRONT ASSOCIATES, LP. (Plaintiff); WARMINGTON HOMES CALIFORNIA, A CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2007
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by WARMINGTON OCEAN FRONT ASSOCIATES, LP. (Plaintiff); WARMINGTON HOMES CALIFORNIA, A CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2007
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by WARMINGTON OCEAN FRONT ASSOCIATES, LP. (Plaintiff); WARMINGTON HOMES CALIFORNIA, A CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2007
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PADILLA CONSTRUCTION CO., A CALIF. CORP. (Defendant); GARRIS PLASTERING (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2006
  • DocketNotice; Filed by WARMINGTON OCEAN FRONT ASSOCIATES, LP. (Plaintiff); WARMINGTON HOMES CALIFORNIA, A CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2006
  • DocketSummons; Filed by WARMINGTON OCEAN FRONT ASSOCIATES, LP. (Plaintiff); WARMINGTON HOMES CALIFORNIA, A CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2006
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2006
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by WARMINGTON OCEAN FRONT ASSOCIATES, LP. (Plaintiff); WARMINGTON HOMES CALIFORNIA, A CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2006
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD TILE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FORD FRAMING COMPANY INC. CALIF. CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA BUILDING SPECIALTIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHN L GINGER MASONRY INC is a litigant