This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2020 at 14:57:29 (UTC).

VILLA, BERNARDINO - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 06/09/2004 VILLA, BERNARDINO - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BECKLOFF, MITCHELL L., STOEVER, THOMAS W. and HAUPTMAN, H. RONALD. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6236

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2004

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BECKLOFF, MITCHELL L.

STOEVER, THOMAS W.

HAUPTMAN, H. RONALD

 

Party Details

Petitioners

NINA OSUMI

VILLA NICHOLAS F.

VILLA BERNARDINO H. III

DUARTE WILLIAM

VILLLA ROBERT

EAVERS ERNESTINE

VILLA CHRISTINA

VILLA SUSIE & RON

EHLERS MARGIE

DURAN FRANCINE

VILLA RUDOLPH

Other

VILLA MARTHA

Decedent

VILLA BERNARDINO

Not Classified By Court

SIEDORF MYRON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COHEN JEFFREY S.

ROGERS JOHN E. JR. ESQ

INGALLS DONALD R.

CHINSKI TOBI J.

KLEIN HOWARD S. ESQ

KLEIN HOWARD S. LAW OFFICES OF

ROSEMBLAT RAPHAEL A. LAW OFFICES OF

FULLER BRUCE P. ESQ

 

Court Documents

Case File - Public

1/1/0001: Case File - Public

Case File - Public

9/27/2007: Case File - Public

Case File - Public

9/27/2007: Case File - Public

Bond (Personal) Upon Qualifying

1/11/2006: Bond (Personal) Upon Qualifying

Order for Probate

1/10/2006: Order for Probate

OTHER - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

12/1/2005: OTHER - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2009
  • DocketTERM: Approval of Final Distribution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2008
  • DocketReceipt (RUDOLPH VILLA Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2008
  • DocketReceipt (BERNARDINO H. VILLA Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2008
  • DocketReceipt (NINA OSUMI Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2008
  • DocketReceipt (CHRISTINA VILLA Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2007
  • DocketReceipt (REBECCA BACON Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2007
  • DocketReceipt (CAREN R. NIELSEN Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2007
  • DocketOrder - Approving Account (Filed by: Attorney for Administrator )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2007
  • DocketNotice (Filed by: Real Party in Interest )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
148 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2004
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2004
  • DocketObjection (Off Calendar Other - Misc. Disposition Manner 1st Hearing Date: 07/22/2004 Complaint Num: 2 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2004
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (1st Hearing Date: 08/02/2004 Filed By: Villa, Bernardino H., III, Petitioner Repres By: Klein, Howard S., Law Offices Of, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 3 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2004
  • DocketProof of Publication (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2004
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2004
  • Docketin Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Hauptman, H. Ronald, Presiding; Appointment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2004
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (1st Hearing Date: 07/22/2004 Filed By: Duarte, William, Petitioner in Pro Per Repres By: Chinski, Tobi J., Former Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2004
  • DocketCreditor's Claim (Filed by: Claimant )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2001
  • DocketNotice - Ruling (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/1957
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VILLA NICHOLAS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer INGALLS DONALD R. ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHINSKI TOBI JO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHEN JEFFREY S. ESQ