This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2020 at 03:34:15 (UTC).

VANESSA COFFEY VS PERRY S. PAUL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/09/2003 VANESSA COFFEY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PERRY S PAUL, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PETERSEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4936

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN PETERSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COFFEY VANESSA

Defendants

ADVANCED SHEET METAL

ALAN BORNSTEIN CONSTRUCTION INC. (ROE 1)

ALL BUILDERS (DOE 6)

B.W. WATERPROOFING (DOE 1)

BUILDING CLEANING SERVICES (ROE 3)

CONCRETE CORING (DOE 8)

DIXON CONCRETE

DOES 1 - 50

GREGG ARCHER CONSTRUCTION (DOE 4)

J. PADILLA INC. (DOE 11)

M&M PLASTERING INC. (DOE 3)

NORTHERN AIR CONCRETE CORING

PERRY S. PAUL NC.

PROGRESSIVE INSULATION & WINDOWS (DOE 2)

R.O. STEWART PLUMBING & HEATING CO. INC

Cross Defendants

ALL BUILDERS

BRUCE W. REEVES DBA B.W. WATERPROOFING

GREG ARCHER CONSTRUCTION

PROGRESSIVE INSTALLATION & WINDOWS

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WOLFSON STEVEN

ALECHULER GROSSMAN STEIN & KAHAN LLP

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MARK J. SKAPIK

ALDERMAN DANIEL SETH

KOLETSKY MANCINI FELDMAN & MORROW

MICHELMAN & ROBINSON LLP

GILL AND BALDWIN LLP

SCHAFFER LAX MCNAUGHTON & CHEN

LAW OFFICES OF ALAN J. CARNEGIE

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

NELSON & GRIFFIN

BLOOM & RUTTENBERG

DONNER FERNANDEZ & LAUBY LLP

MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

BONETATI SASAKI KINCAID & KINCAID INC.

PC KLINEDINST

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2006
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department C; Jury Trial (Trial-Jury; Advanced-This date, o/c settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department C; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced-This date, o/c settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department I; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2006
  • DocketNotice; Filed by VANESSA COFFEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2006
  • Docket(Request-Dismissal); Filed by VANESSA COFFEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2006
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department C; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2006
  • DocketOrder; Filed by ALAN BORNSTEIN CONSTRUCTION, INC. (ROE 1) (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2006
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial; Filed by DIXON CONCRETE (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2006
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2006
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial; Filed by ADVANCED SHEET METAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
232 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2003
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department C; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2003
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2003
  • DocketNotice-Association of Counsel; Filed by VANESSA COFFEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2003
  • DocketComplaint-Amended (1st); Filed by VANESSA COFFEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2003
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by VANESSA COFFEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2003
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by NC. PERRY S. PAUL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2003
  • DocketNotice; Filed by NC. PERRY S. PAUL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2003
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by NC. PERRY S. PAUL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2003
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by VANESSA COFFEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2003
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VANESSA COFFEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M&M PLASTERING, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where J. PADILLA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE INSULATION & WINDOWS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALDERMAN DANIEL S. ESQ.