This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/11/2016 at 11:03:20 (UTC).

Valerie Lynn Garcia Vs. Steven Michael Villa

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Valerie Lynn Garcia against Steven Michael Villa in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9548

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Garcia Valerie Lynn

Respondent

Villa Steven Michael

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2002
  • Judgment (OF DISSOLUTION STATUS TERM 11 -21-02 ) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2002
  • Notice-Entry-Judgment Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2002
  • Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2002
  • Declaration-Default Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2002
  • Declaration-Serv Final Decl of Dis Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2002
  • Proof-Publication Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2001
  • Journal Converted from DOS (Original Journal Code: Received - Fee, Adverse Party )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2001
  • Application-Pub of Summons Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2001
  • Declaration (OF MAILING OR OF INABILITY TO ASC ERTAIN ADDRESS ) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Journal Converted from DOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Summons Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.