This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 01:40:52 (UTC).

TRANSNATION TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION VS MARIAM OGANESYAN

Case Summary

On 06/07/2007 TRANSNATION TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against MARIAM OGANESYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROLF M. TREU and MATTHEW ST. GEORGE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2405

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROLF M. TREU

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRANSNATION TITLE INSURANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 30

OGANESYAN ARMEN

OGANESYAN MARIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CUNNINGHAM FRANCIS J. ESQ.

ROUSSO MARY ANN

GARDENER & RIECHMANN INC.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S NAME CHANGE

6/27/2018: NOTICE OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S NAME CHANGE

WRIT OF EXECUTION (MONEY JUDGMENT)

6/27/2018: WRIT OF EXECUTION (MONEY JUDGMENT)

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER CHANGING JUDGMENT CREDITORS NAME AND AMENDING THE RENEWED JUDGMENT

8/20/2019: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER CHANGING JUDGMENT CREDITORS NAME AND AMENDING THE RENEWED JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARY ANN ROUSSO

8/20/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARY ANN ROUSSO

Order - ORDER PROPOSED CHANGING JUDGMENT CREDITORS NAME

11/21/2019: Order - ORDER PROPOSED CHANGING JUDGMENT CREDITORS NAME

Notice of Ruling

11/21/2019: Notice of Ruling

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

6/8/2011: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

6/30/2011: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

Minute Order -

9/12/2011: Minute Order -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

12/19/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT -

12/21/2017: APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT -

DECLARATION OF MARY ANN ROUSSO RE: TELEPHONIC NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT LIEN

12/21/2017: DECLARATION OF MARY ANN ROUSSO RE: TELEPHONIC NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT LIEN

Minute Order -

12/21/2017: Minute Order -

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Transnation Title Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Transnation Title Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Hearing on Motion for Order (motion for an order changing judgment creditor's name and amending the renewed judgment nunc pro tunc to reflect judgment creditor's current name) - Held - Advanced and Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketOrder (proposed changing Judgment creditors name); Filed by Transnation Title Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Judgment Creditor Fidelity National Title Insuranc...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Transnation Title Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketNotice (AMENDMENT TO NOTICE OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER CHANGING JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S NAME AND AMENDING THE RENEWED JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC TO REFLECT JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S CURRENT NAME); Filed by Transnation Title Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Mary Ann Rousso); Filed by Transnation Title Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketMotion for Order (Changing Judgment Creditors Name and Amending the Renewed Judgment); Filed by Transnation Title Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Transnation Title Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2007
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Transnation Title Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2007
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2007
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2007
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2007
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2007
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2007
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Transnation Title Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2007
  • DocketCOMPLAINT IN SUBROGATION FOR FRAUD, INTENTIONALMISREPRESENTATION; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC372405    Hearing Date: November 21, 2019    Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: November 21, 2019

Case Name: Transnation Title Insurance Corporation v. Oganesyan, et al.

Case No.: BC372405

Motion: Motion to Amend Judgment

Moving Party: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company

Opposing Party: Unopposed

Tentative Ruling: The Motion is granted.

After a series of mergers, the judgment creditor in this action is now Fidelity National Title Insurance Company (“Fidelity”). Fidelity seeks to amend the judgment to insert its name for that of the original judgment creditor. As there is no opposition, the Court amends the judgment in this action nunc pro tunc to update the true name of the judgment creditor. (Code Civ. Proc. § 473(d).) The Motion is granted.