This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/25/2020 at 13:01:48 (UTC).

TOWN & COUNTRY TITLE SERVICES VS MICHELLE MUNCIE

Case Summary

On 08/08/2002 TOWN COUNTRY TITLE SERVICES filed an Other lawsuit against MICHELLE MUNCIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9372

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TOWN & COUNTRY TITLE SERVICES INC.

Defendants and Respondents

AMERICAN BUSINESS LEASING INC.

BANC CORP GROUP

BANC ONE FINANCIAL SERVICES

BANK ONE FINANCIAL SERVICES

CALHOON CALVIN A.

CAPITAL LENDING RESOURCES INC.

CENTERPOINT FINANCIAL INC.

CHAN PHILIP

COMPARAN ANA

CONSECO FINANCE VENDER SERVICES CORP.

FAIRCHILD JOHN C.

GEE GARY

GEE PATRICIA

HIGHTOWER LYNICE H.

HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION OF CALIF

HUO HANS

IMPERIAL BUSINESS CREDIT INC.

JOHN C. MUNCIE

Other

HIGHTOWER LYNCIE C.

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BASS ADAM J. ESQ.

BUCHALTER NEMER FIELDS AND YOUNGER

Defendant, Respondent and Other Attorneys

HEMAR ROUSSO & HEALD LLP

GREGORY P. GOEHRING

KNUDSON JAMES A. ESQ.

DREYFUSS LAWRENCE J.

FEHLMAN ROD E. LAW OFFICE OF

GMELICH THOMAS P. ESQ.

HEMAR & ASSOCIATES LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2003
  • DocketOrder (SECOND REVISED ORDER PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT OF INTERPLEADER ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2003
  • DocketStipulation and Order (REVISED STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN SETTLEMENT OF INTERPLEADER ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2003
  • DocketDeclaration (OF JAMES KNUDSON IN SUPPORT OF ORDER QUASHING PREVIOUSLY ENTERED ORDER ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2003
  • Docketat 08:29 am in Department 64, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; OSC RE Dismissal (AND/OR FILING OF JUDGMENT) - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2003
  • DocketOrder (REVISED ORDER PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT OF INTERPLEADER ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2003
  • DocketStipulation (STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN SETTLEMENT OF INTERPLEADER ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2003
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 64, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Motion (FOR DISCAHRGE, ATTY FEES & COSTS) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2003
  • DocketOrder (PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT OF INTERPLEADER ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2003
  • DocketStipulation and Order (FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2003
  • DocketOrder (PURSUANT TO PARTIAL SETTLEMENT OF INTERPLEADER ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2002
  • DocketNotice (AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2002
  • DocketNotice (AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2002
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2002
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2002
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2002
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2002
  • DocketNotice (AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2002
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2002
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2002
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL LENDING RESOURCES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BANK ONE-PLATINUM ETAL is a litigant

Latest cases where HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORP. OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where TOWN AND COUNTRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. is a litigant