This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/31/2023 at 23:32:54 (UTC).

THE CLERGY CASES I

Case Summary

On 01/02/2003 THE CLERGY CASES I was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL, HALEY J. FROMHOLZ -, EMILIE H. ELIAS, WILLIAM A. MACLAUGHLIN, VICTOR E. CHAVEZ, PETER D. LICHTMAN, CHARLES W. MCCOY, HALEY J. FROMHOLZ, ALEXANDER WILLIAMS, III, MARVIN M. LAGER -, MARVIN M. LAGER, ELIHU M. BERLE and KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4286

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

HALEY J. FROMHOLZ -

EMILIE H. ELIAS

WILLIAM A. MACLAUGHLIN

VICTOR E. CHAVEZ

PETER D. LICHTMAN

CHARLES W. MCCOY

HALEY J. FROMHOLZ

ALEXANDER WILLIAMS, III

MARVIN M. LAGER -

MARVIN M. LAGER

ELIHU M. BERLE

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

B. ROBERT

CARRIGAN MATTHEW [30-2009-00180131]

DOE JOHN MG. [BC438982]

JOHN TH DOE (RE 30-2008-00046614)

ROE JANE [BC322470]

SELIK SALLY

PAINO ERIC NATHAN

DOE JOHN PH [BC453256]

Defendants and Respondents

SOLEDAD ENRICHMENT ACTION INC.

THE ORDER OF FRIAR SERVANTS OF [BC418049]

GUIMAN MICHAEL [FATHER]

DOE 4 [30-2008-00046614]

DIOCES OF ORANGE EDUCATION & WELFARE CORP

DOE 5 A BUSINESS ENTITY OF FORM[BC438982]

MALBURG LEONIS [BC404458]

ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF TEHUACAN

LAS ENCINAS MEDICAL CENTER (DOE 5)

DOE 1 AN INDIVIDUAL [BC438982]

ST. THOMAS THE APOSTLE CHURCH & SCHOOL

Cross Defendant and Defendant

LAS ENCINAS MEDICAL CENTER (DOE 5)

Interested Party

BUCHER MEL

383 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RONALD B. SCHWARTZ LAW OFFICES OF

THE MCGUIRE LAW FIRM

CAMPBELL RENEE L. ESQ.

SULLIVAN & THORESON

BRUSH & SACKS

MATTHEW ELLIOTT GREEN

SOLTAN & ASSOCIATES

WERNER R. MEISSNER LAW OFFICE OF

D. ANTHONY GASTON LAW OFFICE OF

DREW R. ANTABLIN LAW OFFICES OF

FREBERG KATHERINE K. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES & FRIEDMAN LLP

CALLAHAN THOMPSON SHERMAN & CAUDILL LLP

BRUNICK MCELHANEY & BECKETT

HAWKINS PRATA & DALEY LLP

GALTON & HELM LLP

GILBERT KELLY CROWLEY & JENNETT LLP

TAYLOR BLESSEY LLP

O'MELVENY & MYERS LLP

Interested Party Attorney

ARNOLD & PORTER LLP

325 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/05/2020

3/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/05/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/05/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docketat 2:19 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • DocketReport-Status (ON PRODUCTION OF CLERGY FILES PURSUANT TO CLERGY I SETTLEMENTS AND COURT ORDER F/O PLTF LIAISON COUNSEL & ATT PLT F/B BOUCHER LLP CLERGY I); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 324; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Ex Parte Motion; Granted - uncontested) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 324, Emilie H. Elias, Presiding; Ex Parte Motion - Granted - uncontested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-05-21 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25,580 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2002
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2002
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2002
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2002
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2002
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2002
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2002
  • DocketProof of Service RE: DEFENDANT ARMANDO GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2002
  • DocketResponse (NON-PTY PRESS ORG. RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; ); Filed by Interested Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2002
  • DocketNON PARTY PRESS ORGANIZATIONS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2002
  • DocketResponse; Filed by Interested Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less