This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 17:13:55 (UTC).

TERESA BRADBURY VS LOCKHEED CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/09/2007 TERESA BRADBURY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOCKHEED CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER, MARY H. STROBEL and JOHN A. TORRIBIO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8840

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

MARY H. STROBEL

JOHN A. TORRIBIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRADBURY TERESA

Defendants

ALLIED SIGNAL INC.

AMCHEM PRODUCTS INC.

AMERICAN CYANIMIDE CO.

ARCO CHEMICAL CO.

ASHLAND CHEMICAL COMPANY

ASHLAND OIL INC.

B.F. GOODRICH ADHESIVE SYSTEMS

B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY THE

CASTROL INC.

CHASE CHEMICAL

CHEMICALS CO.

DEVCON CORP.

DEVCON-RUST LICK

DEXTER CORP. THE

DOES 1 THROUGH 250

DOW CORNING CORP.

DYKEM CO.

E.I. DUPOINT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY

EXXON CORP.

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GIRARDI THOMAS VINCENT

WALTER LAWRENCE A. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

SANDRA L. WEIHERER

COHEN DEIDRE F. ESQ.

STEWART IAN A. ESQ.

HUNT JAMES W.

THOMPSON BARRY J. ESQ.

LEVIN JASON

WEIHERER SANDRA L.

ARBRISTER CYRIL E. ESQ.

GERAGHTY MARK S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Dismiss - MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL IN FIVE YEARS

11/15/2019: Motion to Dismiss - MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL IN FIVE YEARS

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

11/21/2019: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

2/23/2012: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY'S NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

1/2/2013: DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY'S NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

11/12/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

1/16/2015: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department G, John A. Torribio, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (For Failure to Bring Case to Trial in Five Years) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss For Failure to Bring Case to Tri...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Lockheed Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice as to Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action); Filed by Teresa Bradbury (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss (For Failure to Bring Case to Trial in Five Years); Filed by Ashland Chemical Company (Defendant); Union Oil Co. of California (Defendant); Shell Oil Co. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2008
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2008
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2008-02-06 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2007
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2007
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERRATA RE: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2007
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2007
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2007
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH BASED ON: 1. FRADULENT CONCEALMENT, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2007
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Teresa Bradbury (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC378840    Hearing Date: December 13, 2019    Dept: SEG

TERESA BRADBURY v. LOCKHEED CORPORATION ET AL

CASE NO.:

HEARING: 12/13/19

TENTATIVE ORDER

Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Bring Case to Trial in Five Years is Granted.