This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/31/2015 at 17:55:31 (UTC).

TAU LOGO VS. HON INDUSTRIES, INC., ET-AL.

Case Summary

On 02/20/2001 TAU LOGO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HON INDUSTRIES, INC , ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAW & MOTION, JUDITH A. VANDER LANS and MARLENE KRISTOVICH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4288

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAW & MOTION

JUDITH A. VANDER LANS

MARLENE KRISTOVICH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOGO TAU

Defendants

APELES FLORENTINO C.

CORRYHIEBERT CORPORATION SUBSIDIARY

DISCOUNT EQUIPMENT COMPANY INC.

HON INDUSTRIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KROL & KOERNER LAW OFFICES OF .

Defendant Attorneys

BARTHOLOMEW & ASSOCIATES LAW OFFICES OF

CRISWELL ARTER HADDEN LAW OFFICES OF

ZURAWSKI JAMES P. LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2002
  • Request for Dismissal (dismissal entered as to entire action, w/ prej ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2002
  • Partial Dismissal (dismissal entered as to dft florentino apeles dba singtronics, w/ prej ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2002
  • Stipulation (for settlement; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2002
  • Reply to Opposition (to pltf's oppositon to motion to reclassify ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2002
  • Notice of Motion (motion for judgment on the plead- ings; by dft discount equip co; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2002
  • Miscellaneous-Other (motions in limine #1 thru 6 by dft discount equip; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2002
  • Miscellaneous-Other (dft discount's trial docs: exhibit list; witness list; pro jury inst; proof of service ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2002
  • Opposition (to reclassify case to limited case ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2002
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2002
  • Notice of Motion (TO RECLASSIFY CASE AS LIMITED JURISDICTION; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2001
  • General Denial (by dft discount equipment co inc. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2001
  • Proof of Service (ON D.E.C. STORES DISCOUNT EQUIPMENT/BY JUDY HERNANDEZ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2001
  • Notice of Ruling (RE STC 9/26/01 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2001
  • Amendment to Complaint (DOE 1 AS D.E.C. STORES DISCOUNT EQUIPMENT CO. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2001
  • Answer to Complaint Filed (by dft florentino c. apeles dba singtronics ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2001
  • Answer to Unverified Complaint (by dfts hon industries, inc and corryhiebert corporation ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2001
  • Proof of Service (on singtronics/by patrick abeles ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2001
  • Miscellaneous-Other (original proof of service re summons, complaint and notice of amt of damages sought on deft hon industries, inc. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2001
  • Proof of Service (as to hon industries, inc. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2001
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HON INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZURAWSKI JAMES P. ESQ.