Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 09:17:28 (UTC).

SUZANNE SMITH ET AL VS A W CHESTERTON COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/20/2007 SUZANNE SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RITA MILLER and MORRIS B. JONES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4595

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RITA MILLER

MORRIS B. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABEL JASON

SMITH DEBRA

SMITH SUZANNE

Defendants and Respondents

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

AMERICAN PRESIDENT LINES LTD.

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

BECHTEL GROUP INC.

BONDEX INTERNATIONAL INC.

BORG WARNER INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS

BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

BUFFALO PUMPS INC.

BW/IP INC.

BW/IP INTERNATIONAL INC.

CBS CORPORATION

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

CROWLEY MARITIME CORPORATION

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC.

DOES1 - 300

ELEMENTIS CHEMICALS INC.

50 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWARD CRYSTAL G.

Defendant Attorneys

BATES TALCOTT N.

BROWN EUGENE JR.

FARKAS STEPHEN P.

GOWIN JULIA A.

GUNNING BRADLEY W.

HAKE WILLIAM M. ESQ.

HINGLE STEPHANIE A.

LONNIE DOMMOND E.

AGHABEG DENA S.

JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

HUGO EDWARD ROGER ESQ.

HAMBLETT ROBERT M. ESQ.

HAKE WILLIAM M.

KASHANI MAHSA M.

KNOTT STEVEN E. ESQ.

MARTIN WILLIAM O. JR. ESQ.

JAMES JON C. ESQUIRE

CHAN MACY M.

GOLDBERG A. SCOTT ESQ.

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/30/2008: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

2/8/2008: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF RULING

3/7/2008: NOTICE OF RULING

NOTICE OF RULING

6/6/2008: NOTICE OF RULING

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

8/29/2008: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

STIPULATION AND ORDER SHORTENING NOTICE PERIOR ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION

2/6/2009: STIPULATION AND ORDER SHORTENING NOTICE PERIOR ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR , ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

2/17/2009: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR , ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT , OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE , SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

2/18/2009: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT , OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE , SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF CRANE CO.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/18/2009: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF CRANE CO.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

CRANE CO.S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/18/2009: CRANE CO.S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANYS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC.

2/18/2009: DEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANYS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT VIKING PUMP, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC

2/18/2009: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT VIKING PUMP, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

3/17/2009: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE NOT DISCLOSED DURING DISCOVERY

4/1/2009: DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE NOT DISCLOSED DURING DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF RULING

4/27/2009: NOTICE OF RULING

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/25/2009: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

7/24/2009: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order

8/10/2009: Minute Order

322 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2009
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 16; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 16; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 16; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
739 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2007
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANY A/K/A ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVAL ACTION - ASBESTOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2007
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2007
  • DocketDEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.'S DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2007
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2007
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2007
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2007
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVAL ACTION-ASBESTOS (NEGLIGENCE; STRICT LIABILITY; FALSE REPRESENTATION; INTENTIONAL TORT/INTENTIONAL FAILURE TO WARN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2007
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Suzanne Smith (Plaintiff); Debra Smith (Plaintiff); Jason Abel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2007
  • DocketDECLARATION OF SUZANNE SMITH UNDER C.C.P. SECTION 377.32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BORG WARNER INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS is a litigant

Latest cases where Crowley Maritime Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where BECHTEL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BONDEX INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant