This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2015 at 09:41:46 (UTC).

SUZANNE PAIR ET AL VS. AFSHIN MOGHAVEM ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/15/2003 SUZANNE PAIR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AFSHIN MOGHAVEM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN L. SEGAL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0133

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN L. SEGAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAIR SUZANNE

Defendants

AFSHIN MOGHAVEM

FOSTER TEPPER INC.

MOGHAVEM PAULINE

TEPPER FOSTER

ZIMMERMANN KOOMER CONNOLLY & FINKLE

ZIMMERMANN SCOTT Z.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EPPORT RICHMAN & ROBBINS

Defendant Attorneys

FOSTER TEPPER INC.

NEMECEK & COLE

SHAFRON ALTSCHULD & KAMMER

ZIMMERMANN KOOMER CONNOLLY & FINKEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2007
  • DocketRemittitur filed (THE PARTIES ARE TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS OF APPEAL. APPEAL AFFIRMED.) Filed by Second Appellate District

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2007
  • DocketAcknow of Satisfaction of Judgment (FULL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2005
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (AND NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE ATTORNEYS FEES MOITON OF AFSHIN AND PAULINE MOGHAVEM ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2005
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (ON ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2005
  • DocketBrief (REPLY BRIEF TO OPP TO MTN FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2005
  • DocketReply To Motion (REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR THE AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2005
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2005
  • DocketMemo points & authorities Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2005
  • DocketDeclaration (OF STEVEN N. RICHMAN IN SUPPORT OF OPP TO MTN FOR THE AWARD OF ATTYS' FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2005
  • DocketObjection Document Filed (TO MTN TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
274 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2004
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO STRIKE VOL. 3 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2004
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2004
  • DocketMotion to Strike Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2004
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (COMPENDIUM FO EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO STRIKE VOL. 1 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT RE JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2004
  • DocketNtc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2004
  • DocketProof of Service (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2004
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Com Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2003
  • DocketProof of Service (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less