This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 18:04:48 (UTC).

STEARNS CONRAD AND SCHMIDT CONSULTING ENGINEERS INC VS CAPIT

Case Summary

On 01/29/2007 STEARNS CONRAD AND SCHMIDT CONSULTING ENGINEERS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAPIT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5393

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SCS ENGINEERS

STEARNS CONRAD AND SCHMIDT CONSULTING

Defendants

CVE AHP

CVE DEVELOPMENT INC.

M.L. SHEPARD LLP

M.L. SHEPARD LP

MARLTON SQUARE ASSOCIATES

MARLTON SQUARE ASSOCIATES LLC

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

IRVINE LAW GROUP LLP

HAWBAKER THOMAS A. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI

KOORENNY & TEITELBAUM LLP

IRVING CLINTON T.

SMITH LILLIS PITHA LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/7/2008: Minute Order

APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF SCS ENGINEERS TO CONTINUE THE JANUARY 9, 2008 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC.

1/7/2008: APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF SCS ENGINEERS TO CONTINUE THE JANUARY 9, 2008 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC.

DECLARATAION OF MARTIN L. PITHA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

3/6/2008: DECLARATAION OF MARTIN L. PITHA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

DECLARATION OF JOHN W. HEATH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

3/6/2008: DECLARATION OF JOHN W. HEATH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

DEFENDANT JOHN W. HEATHS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

3/6/2008: DEFENDANT JOHN W. HEATHS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

DEFENDANT JOHN W. HEATHS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

3/6/2008: DEFENDANT JOHN W. HEATHS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

[PROPOSED] ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JOHN W. HEATH

3/10/2008: [PROPOSED] ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JOHN W. HEATH

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION RE DEFENDANT JOHN W. HEATHS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

3/21/2008: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION RE DEFENDANT JOHN W. HEATHS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

Minute Order

3/28/2008: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

4/29/2008: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

5/13/2008: Minute Order

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

5/22/2008: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSE-CIVIL

7/18/2008: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSE-CIVIL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL -CIVIL

7/18/2008: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL -CIVIL

Minute Order

8/27/2008: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING; AND NOTICE OF OSC RE WHY THE ANSWER SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN FOR FAILURE TO CURE THE PAYMENT OF THE ANSWER FEE

9/4/2008: NOTICE OF RULING; AND NOTICE OF OSC RE WHY THE ANSWER SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN FOR FAILURE TO CURE THE PAYMENT OF THE ANSWER FEE

Minute Order

9/25/2008: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING AND NOTICE OF OSC RE SANCTIONS AND/OR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT

10/1/2008: NOTICE OF RULING AND NOTICE OF OSC RE SANCTIONS AND/OR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/09/2010

DocketSTATEMENT OF DAMAGES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2010

DocketApplication ; Filed by Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting (Plaintiff); SCS Engineers (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2010

DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting (Plaintiff); SCS Engineers (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2010

DocketRequest; Filed by Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting (Plaintiff); SCS Engineers (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2010

DocketApplication ; Filed by Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting (Plaintiff); SCS Engineers (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2010

DocketNotice; Filed by Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting (Plaintiff); SCS Engineers (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2010

DocketNotice; Filed by Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting (Plaintiff); SCS Engineers (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2010

DocketNotice; Filed by Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting (Plaintiff); SCS Engineers (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2010

DocketNotice; Filed by Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting (Plaintiff); SCS Engineers (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2010

DocketNotice; Filed by Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting (Plaintiff); SCS Engineers (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
505 More Docket Entries
04/11/2007

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2007

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2007

DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2007

DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SECOND NOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2007

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2007

DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2007

DocketSUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2007

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2007

DocketComplaint; Filed by Stearns, Conrad and Schmidt Consulting (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2007

DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less