This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2015 at 17:46:10 (UTC).

Seth Coltan Vs L Ermitage Hotel Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Labor - Other Labor case was filed by Seth Coltan against L Ermitage Hotel Corporation in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6620

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Suzanne G. Bruguera

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coltan Seth

Defendants

Burton Way Hotel Inc.

L'ermitage Hotel Corporation

Raffles Properties Inc.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2002
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2001
  • Proof of Service Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2001
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference (STATEMENT. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2001
  • Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Order to Continue MSC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2001
  • Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Order Resetting MSC to 11-15-01 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2001
  • Objection Document (TO PLAINTIFF'S LATE-FILED REPLY PAPERS; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2001
  • Reply/Response (TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSID- ERATION OF THIS COURT'S JULY 26, 2001 ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS DEMURRER; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2001
  • Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE OFFERED BY PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RECON- SIDERATION; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2001
  • Opposition Document (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THIS COURT'S JULY 26, 2001 ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS DEMURRER; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2001
  • Objection (TO EVIDENCE OFFERED BY PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2001
  • Request (SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2001
  • Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO, AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2001
  • Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO, AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF, PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2001
  • Demurrer (TO, AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF, PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMA GES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2001
  • Demurrer (TO, AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF, PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2001
  • Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO, AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF, PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMA GES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2001
  • Points and Authorities (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO, AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • Amendment to Complaint (Doe II to be Raffles Properties, Inc. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • Amendment to Complaint (Doe I to be Burton Way Hotel, Inc. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.