This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2020 at 11:07:13 (UTC).

SEAN STEWART HEPLER VS DIANE MARIE BRANAGAN; ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2005 SEAN STEWART HEPLER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIANE MARIE BRANAGAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEON S KAPLAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2755

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEON S KAPLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEPLER SEAN STEWART

Defendants

BERNBACK MICHAEL

BRANANGAN DIANE MARIE

DOES 1-100

MICHAEL LESLIE PRODUCTIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KORO CHARLES EDWIN

Defendant Attorney

SILVERMAN STEVEN H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketPaper file destroyed; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • Docketin Department NWB, LEON S KAPLAN, Presiding; Non-Calendar Matter - Dismissal-No appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2006
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2006
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department NWB, LEON S KAPLAN, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Held-Not settled, conf & trial set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2006
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2006
  • DocketNotice-Continuance; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2006
  • DocketNotice-Continuance; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2006
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2005
  • DocketProof of Service-Summons & Com (P/S MICHAEL LESLIE PRODUCTIONS ON 11/16/05 ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2005
  • DocketDemand-Jury Trial; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2005
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2005
  • DocketProof of Service-Summons & Com (P/S MICHAEL BERNBACK ON 10/16/05 ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2005
  • DocketProof of Service-Summons & Com (P/S DIANE MARIE BRANAGA ON 10/16/05 ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2005
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MICHAEL LESLIE PRODUCTIONS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SILVERMAN STEVEN H. ESQ