Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2020 at 10:08:01 (UTC).

SCOTT J. BERGER, ET AL VS. DR. YOUNG S. KIM, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/26/2005 SCOTT J BERGER filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DR YOUNG S KIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH R. KALIN, CARY NISHIMOTO and BOB T. HIGHT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1949

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSEPH R. KALIN

CARY NISHIMOTO

BOB T. HIGHT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERGER SCOTT J.

Defendants

BERKOWITZ KATHLEEN M.D.

BIER ROBERT M.D.

CHAN KENNETH M.D.

DR. YOUNG S. KIM

FRANCINE ARETO M.D.

GLASSY ERIC F. M.D.

GOOD SAMARITAN MEDICAL PRACTICE

GOULD GAIL R.D.M.S.

HEALTH NET HMO

HEIKALI MOOSA M.D.

JACQUES DR. CARLINE LOUIS

LA VIDA MEDICAL GROUP IPA

LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY HOSPITAL

MAGELLA MEDICAL GROUP INC.

MCNULTY JENNIFER M.D.

NADELLA NAGAMANI M.D.

NAGEOTTE MICHAEL M.D.

RICHARDSON PATTI. H. M.D.

Minor

BERGER JOSHUA ADAM BY AND THRU HIS

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STANLEY MARTIN LAW OFFICE OF

Defendant Attorneys

MEDVEDEV LYUDMILA DOE 2

PETERSON GEORGE E.

REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARFORD & STOCKA

LAW + BRANDMEYER LLP

WOLD LAW GROUP

TORABI KASRA

HOLM MARGARET

BONNE BRIDGES MUELLER O'KEEFE/NICHOLS

HERZFELD & RUBIN

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

THIES LEE M.

KRAMER DEBOER ENDELICATO & KEANE

MAYER PATRICK W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by KENNETH, M.D. CHAN (Defendant); MAGELLA MEDICAL GROUP, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 35; (OSC-Failure to File Judgment; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 35; (OSC-Failure to 'OTHER'; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 35; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs (Motion to Tax Costs; Granted in Part) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 35; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs (Motion to Tax Costs; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
678 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2005
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2005
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2005
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2005
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by SCOTT J. BERGER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2005
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by SCOTT J. BERGER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2005
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM- CIVIL ); Filed by Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2005
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2005
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by SCOTT J. BERGER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2005
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2005
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SCOTT J. BERGER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA VIDA MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where MAGELLA MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Health Net Health Plan of Oregon, Inc. is a litigant