This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2020 at 10:55:10 (UTC).

SBB ROOFING, INC. VS. DENISE VENTLING

Case Summary

On 08/26/2005 SBB ROOFING, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DENISE VENTLING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7369

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SBB ROOFING INC.

BILT-WELL ROOF & MATERIAL CO.

SBB CORP.

Defendants

CATES DORAN

VENTLING DENISE

LAW OFFICES OF SCOTT A. COX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DICKER & DICKER LLP

ABDULAZIZ & GROSSBART

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SCOTT A. COX

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2007
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2007
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by DENISE VENTLING (Defendant); DORAN CATES (Defendant); LAW OFFICES OF SCOTT A. COX (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F46; Nunc Pro Tunc Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order; Case Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F46, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Case Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO SECTION 664.6 CCP ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F46; (Trial-Vacated; OSC Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F46, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Trial-Vacated (2 DAY ESTIMATE) - OSC Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F46; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F46, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Final Status Conference (CRT TRIAL 8-28-06) - Matter Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2005
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by SBB ROOFING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2005
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by SBB ROOFING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2005
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by SBB ROOFING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2005
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by SBB ROOFING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2005
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by SBB ROOFING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2005
  • DocketProof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SUBSERVED ON 09/18/05 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2005
  • DocketDeclaration (OF DILIGENCE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2005
  • DocketProof of Service (BY MAIL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2005
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2005
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.B.B. is a litigant

Latest cases where SBB ROOFING INC. AKA BILT WELL ROOF AND MATERIAL CO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant