This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 00:23:05 (UTC).

SAB INVESTMENT PROPERTY LLC VS TUNEUP MASTERS INC

Case Summary

On 06/05/2007 SAB INVESTMENT PROPERTY LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against TUNEUP MASTERS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2230

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAB INVESTMENT PROPERTY LLC

Defendant

TUNEUP MASTERS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANDLER STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/11/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/10/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/9/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/26/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/11/2008: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/11/2008: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

DECLARATION OF STEVEN SANDLER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DEFAULT

10/8/2008: DECLARATION OF STEVEN SANDLER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DEFAULT

Minute Order

10/10/2008: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

10/10/2008: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

ORDER CONVERTING CASE FROM UNLAWFUL DETAINER TO CIVIL CASE

10/10/2008: ORDER CONVERTING CASE FROM UNLAWFUL DETAINER TO CIVIL CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/29/2008: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

11/3/2008: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45; Court Order (Court Order; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2008
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SAB Investment Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2008
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45; Further Status Conference (Further Status Conference; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • DocketOrder; Filed by SAB Investment Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • DocketORDER CONVERTING CASE FROM UNLAWFUL DETAINER TO CIVIL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2007
  • DocketRESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45; (OSC RE Dismissal; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2007
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2007
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2007
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SAB Investment Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2007
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAB INVESTMENT PROPERTY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDLER STEVEN