Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2020 at 12:39:10 (UTC).

ROBERT KELLY, JR., ET AL VS SARIDAKIS CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2004 ROBERT KELLY, JR filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against SARIDAKIS CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK S. ARNOLD, RAMONA G. SEE and CARY NISHIMOTO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8806

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK S. ARNOLD

RAMONA G. SEE

CARY NISHIMOTO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KELLY ROBERT JR.

KELLY TRACY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

A & D PAINTING & DECORATING DOE 128

A&A READY MIX CONCRETE INC. DOE 119

A&D PLASTERING INC.--AND DOE 101 ON AMEND

ALLIED INSULATION AND DOE 121 ON AMEND.

ARCHITECTURAL & CV ENGINEERS INC.DOE 201

BARDALES NELSON DBA FOUR SEASONS-DOE 125

BERNIE'S LANDSCAPING--DOE 104--ON AMEND.

BERNIE'S TREE SERVICE DOE 124

C.M.A. ELECTRICAL INC. DOE 122

CARPET PROS INC.---DOE 115

CHANCE PAUL--DOE 106- ON AMEND TO COMP.

CREATIVE PRODUCTS-----DOE 113 IN AMEND.TO

DENN ENGINEERS DOE 202

DOOR SALES---DOE 114- ON AMEND. TO COMPL.

DW MATTESON---DOE 110 ON AMEND.TO COMPL.

E-KO DRYWALL & CONSTRUCTION CORP.DOE 123

Cross Defendants

A&A READYMIX CONCRETE

A&D PLASTERING INC.--AND DOE 101 ON AMEND

ALLIED INSULATION AND DOE 121 ON AMEND.

CMA ELECTRICAL

CREATIVE PRODUCTS-----DOE 113 IN AMEND.TO

DW MATTESON---DOE 110 ON AMEND.TO COMPL.

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTRO JOEL B.

Defendant Attorneys

DALE BRADEN & HINCHCLIFFE

HOLLINGSHEAD & ASSO.

LEE TED M.

MILLS LAW CORPORATION

MURCHISON AND CUMMING

PADILLA & ASSOCIATES

PANMAN ROBERT H.

POLLARD ARCHER CRANERT GOOGOOIAN & STEVEN

THOMAS WAYNE & ASSO.

VAISBORT & ASSO.

MARTIN MICHAEL G.

ARENS RUSSELL R.

KOLETSKY MANCINI FELDMAN & MORROW

YOUNGERMAN & MCNUTT LLP

SANDERS CARYN BROTTMAN

O'HARA MAUREEN C. LAW OFFICE OF

ROSENBAUM MARK J.

KRANKER GARY S.

FORGE & RIFAT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2007
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by ROBERT, JR. KELLY (Plaintiff); TRACY KELLY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E; (Court's Order to Show Cause; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ROBERT, JR. KELLY (Plaintiff); TRACY KELLY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2007
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by ROBERT, JR. KELLY (Plaintiff); TRACY KELLY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2006
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by ROBERT, JR. KELLY (Plaintiff); TRACY KELLY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2006
  • DocketNotice; Filed by ROBERT, JR. KELLY (Plaintiff); TRACY KELLY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E; (Court's Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2006
  • DocketNotice; Filed by ROBERT, JR. KELLY (Plaintiff); TRACY KELLY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by ROBERT, JR. KELLY (Plaintiff); TRACY KELLY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by ROBERT, JR. KELLY (Plaintiff); TRACY KELLY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
288 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2004
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SARIDAKIS CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant); MELENLAOS SARIDAKIS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2004
  • DocketNotice; Filed by ROBERT, JR. KELLY (Plaintiff); TRACY KELLY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2004
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by DW MATTESON---DOE 110 ON AMEND.TO COMPL. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2004
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ROBERT, JR. KELLY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2004
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by ROBERT, JR. KELLY (Plaintiff); TRACY KELLY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2004
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ROBERT, JR. KELLY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2004
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2004
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by ROBERT, JR. KELLY (Plaintiff); TRACY KELLY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2004
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ROBERT, JR. KELLY (Plaintiff); TRACY KELLY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/1996
  • DocketOpposition; Filed by SARIDAKIS CONSTRUCTION INC. (Defendant); MELENLAOS SARIDAKIS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARPET PROS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DOOR SALES INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where E-KO DRYWALL CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDERS CARYN BROTTMAN