This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/24/2020 at 08:30:11 (UTC).

ROBERT E. GREEN JR. ET AL VS. FORECAST HOMES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/16/2002 ROBERT E GREEN JR filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against FORECAST HOMES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RODNEY E. NELSON, CAROLYN B. KUHL and MORRIS B. JONES. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2121

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2002

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RODNEY E. NELSON

CAROLYN B. KUHL

MORRIS B. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BACON MARCEL

BRYANT CONNIE

BRYANT EAVIN

EXIGA JUAN

GREEN CLARENCE

GREEN DARLENE

GREEN ROBERT E. JR.

GUITIRREZ FRANCIS

HASROUTY NORA ANN

LARSON SVEN

LEE JOHN

LEE WENDY

MIZRAHI JESSE

MIZRAHI KAREN

MONTESDEOCH MICHAEL

NIEMES VERANICA

SOLANO HECTOR

SOLANO ROBERTA

TAFOWLLA ROSALINDA

Defendant and Respondent

A J ROOFING

109 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FREEMAN MATTHEW C. ESQ.

FREEMAN LEE A. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CLEMENTS & KNOCK

BRACHMAN MITCHELL S. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

WAMAGIERIS GREG R

HAWLEY KELLI G.

ACKER KATHRYN S. ESQ.

HUDSON BLAKE A.

LINDA M. LIBERTUCCI LAW OFFICES OF

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND LAW O/O

SPANIAC KATHARINE L

O'CONNOR MICHAEL J ESQ.

LEE TED M

BRAGG KATHLEEN

WHITE JOHN R. ESQ.

LARRIVA RICHARD P

SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR LAW O/O

SAMSON MARC ESQ.

RHODES BRIAN W

19 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2003
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (***CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY FORCAST HOMES, INC. FROM THE CROSS-COMPLAINT AS TO CREST DOOR & TRIM ONLY W/ PREJUDICE*** ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2003
  • DocketNotice of Association of Attorneys (FOR CREST DOOR & TRIM, INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2003
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2003
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2003
  • DocketCross-complaint; Filed by Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2003
  • DocketNotice of Association of Attorneys; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • DocketCross-complaint; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2002
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2002
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2002
  • DocketProof of Service (PARTY SERVED: STEEL T A/C INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2002
  • DocketProof of Service (PARTY SERVED: INTERSTATE SHEET METAL ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2002
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2002
  • DocketNotice-Status Conference-EMPP; Filed by Court Attendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2002
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2002
  • DocketCross-complaint; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2002
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2002
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2002
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2002
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LARRIVA RICHARD P. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAMSON MARC

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RHODES, BRIAN W

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAWLEY KELLI GAY