This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2020 at 08:31:32 (UTC).

ROBERT COOPER VS CENTURY 21 ALL PROPERTIES INC

Case Summary

On 06/17/2005 ROBERT COOPER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CENTURY 21 ALL PROPERTIES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY W. ALARCON, VICTOR E. CHAVEZ and ANDRIA K. RICHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5187

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY W. ALARCON

VICTOR E. CHAVEZ

ANDRIA K. RICHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOPER ROBERT LAW OFFICES OF

Defendants and Respondents

AMERISPEC HOME INSPECTION SERVICE

ASCHENBRENNER GARY

CENTURY 21 ALL PROPERTIES INC.

GONZALES DAWN

PARAMOUNT PROPERTIES

RILEY TIM

RODEO REALTY INC.

RUIZ MICHAEL

SENTREX EXTERMINATOR COMPANY

SMITH MARVIN O. III

TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SINGLETON JOSEPH W. ESQ.

INGERSON GREGORY M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MANSUKHANI ROGER ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM D. KOEHLER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 96; (Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2007
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2007
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cooper, Robert, Law Offices of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2007
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 96; (Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2007
  • DocketMotion for an Order; Filed by Cooper, Robert, Law Offices of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2007
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2007
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2007
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2007
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2007
  • DocketDECLARATION & ORDER FOR REF. OF JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
508 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2005
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2005
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2005
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Amerispec Home Inspection Service (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2005
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2005
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2005
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2005
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2005
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2005
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) COMMON LAW NEGLIGENCE; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2005
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cooper, Robert, Law Offices of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARAMOUNT PROPERTIES is a litigant

Latest cases where RODEO REALTY is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANSUKHANI ROGER MOHAN