This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/06/2020 at 22:50:20 (UTC).

RITCH FAMILY TRUST OF 1990

Case Summary

On 11/29/2007 RITCH FAMILY TRUST OF 1990 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BECKLOFF, MITCHELL L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7922

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BECKLOFF, MITCHELL L.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

RITCH HERALD LESTER

HALE ROBERT GRAYDON JR

RITCH HERALD LA VERN

Not Classified By Court

RITCH HERALD L.

RITCH FAMILY TRUST OF 1990

RITCH CAROLINE L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ZWICKER LAURA A. ATTORNEY AT LAW

 

Court Documents

Case File - Public

1/1/0001: Case File - Public

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2008
  • DocketOrder (order establishing trust's ownership of personal property and directing its transfer to tr. Repres By: Zwicker, Laura A., Attorney at Law, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Hale, Robert Graydon, Jr., Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2008
  • Docketin Stanley Mosk Dept. - 5, Beckloff, Mitchell L., Presiding; Probate Code 850 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2007
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2007
  • DocketDeclaration (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • DocketPetition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code) (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted After Trial - Uncontested 1st Hearing Date: 01/09/2008 Filed By: Ritch, Herald La Vern, Petitioner Repres By: Zwicker, Laura A., Attorney at Law, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE RICH FAMILY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZWICKER LAURA ANNE