This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2015 at 13:45:26 (UTC).

RICHARD SOLOMON VS. VIEWMONT INVESTMENTS ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2007 RICHARD SOLOMON filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VIEWMONT INVESTMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LINDA K. LEFKOWITZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2860

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LINDA K. LEFKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLOMON RICHARD

Defendants

JONES SCOTT

MUELLER MICHAEL

VIEWMONT INVESTMENTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE CASTRO WEST CHODOROW GLICKFELD&NASS

Defendant Attorney

BEST BEST & KRIEGER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2008
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2007
  • Notice (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL JERRY L. KAY ATTY FOR PLTF FROM 12-15-07 - 1-5-08 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2007
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2007
  • Stipulation and Order (APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDERS (1)STAYING ACTION FOR INVOLUNTARY DISSOLUTION OF LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AND (2)APPOINTING APPRAISERS TO VALUE INTEREST OF RICHARD SOLOMON AND) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2007
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE 4TH CAUSE OF ACTION ONLY! ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2007
  • Reply To Motion (reply to opposition to demurrers to third cause of action ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2007
  • Opposition (to demurrers to third cause of action of verified complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2007
  • Memo points & authorities (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STAY AND APPOINTING APPRAISERS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2007
  • Defendant's Demurrer (TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2007
  • Deft's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer (TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2007
  • Declaration (OF D. BRIAN REIDER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STAY AND APPOINTING APPRAISERS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2007
  • Memo points & authorities (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2007
  • Motion for an Order ((1)STAYING ACTION FOR INVOLUNTARY DISSOLUTION OF LLC AND (2)APPOINTING APPRAISERS TO VALUE INTEREST OF RICHARD SOLOMON ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2007
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2007
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2007
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIEWMONT INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant