This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 15:43:39 (UTC).

Reyes, Carlos I. Vs Castillo, Judith M.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Reyes Carlos I against Castillo Judith M in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3975

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Reyes Carlos I.

Respondent

Castillo Judith M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2001
  • Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • Response Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2001
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Child Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2001
  • Petition-Dissolution Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2001
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.