This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2016 at 00:33:04 (UTC).

POLLIA, MURIEL - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 08/18/2005 POLLIA, MURIEL - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is REID, JOHN H.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6570

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

REID, JOHN H.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NYHUS WARD R. JR

Claimants

MBNA AMERICA

CHASE BANK U.S.A.

AMERICAN EXPRESS

CATHEDRAL OF OUR LADY OF THE ANGELS

CITICORP CREDIT SERVICE INC.

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Decedent

POLLIA MURIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CREUTZ MARY G.

BECKER BALOGH

PHILLIPS AND COHEN ASSOC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2011
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order (SIGNED BY JUDGE BIDERMAN Filed By: NYHUS, WARD R. JR., Petitioner Repres. By: CREUTZ, MARY G., Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • DocketTERM: Approval of Final Distribution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • DocketReceipt (FOR EXECUTOR'S COMMISSIONS Filed By: NYHUS, WARD R. JR., Petitioner Repres. By: CREUTZ, MARY G., Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • DocketReceipt (FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION BY THE MURIEL POLLIA FOUNDATION Filed By: NYHUS, WARD R. JR., Petitioner Repres. By: CREUTZ, MARY G., Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • DocketReceipt (FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES Filed By: NYHUS, WARD R. JR., Petitioner Repres. By: CREUTZ, MARY G., Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2007
  • DocketOrder (SETTLING FIRST & FINAL ACCT, FEES, EXTRA FEES, DIST AND FOR DISCH SIGNED BY JUDGE REID Filed By: NYHUS, WARD R. JR., Petitioner Repres. By: CREUTZ, MARY G., Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2007
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2007
  • DocketSupplement (SECOND TO FIRST AND FINAL ACCT Filed By: NYHUS, WARD R. JR., Petitioner Repres. By: CREUTZ, MARY G., Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2007
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (For Hearing dated: 2007-04-13 Filed By: NYHUS, WARD R. JR., Petitioner Repres. By: CREUTZ, MARY G., Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • DocketSupplement (FIRST TO FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, ETC. Filed By: NYHUS, WARD R. JR., Petitioner Repres. By: CREUTZ, MARY G., Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2005
  • DocketCreditor's Claim (CR CL OF AMERICAN EXPRESS $36,844.55 Filed By: AMERICAN EXPRESS, Claimant )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2005
  • DocketCreditor's Claim (CR CL OF AMERICAN EXPRESS $36,844.55 Filed By: AMERICAN EXPRESS, Claimant )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2005
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Filed By: NYHUS, WARD R. JR., Petitioner Repres. By: CREUTZ, MARY G., Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2005
  • DocketLetters (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Issued To: NYHUS, WARD R. JR., Petitioner Repres. By: CREUTZ, MARY G., Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2005
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Filed By: NYHUS, WARD R. JR., Petitioner Repres. By: CREUTZ, MARY G., Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2005
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative (PATTI KRAAKEVIK APPT PROB REFEREE SIGNED BY JUDGE REID Filed By: NYHUS, WARD R. JR., Petitioner Repres. By: CREUTZ, MARY G., Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2005
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2005
  • DocketProof of Publication (Filed By: NYHUS, WARD R. JR., Petitioner Repres. By: CREUTZ, MARY G., Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2005
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed By: NYHUS, WARD R. JR., Petitioner Repres. By: CREUTZ, MARY G., Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2005
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (1st Hearing Date: 10/21/2005 Filed By: NYHUS, WARD R. JR., Petitioner Repres. By: CREUTZ, MARY G., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less