This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/24/2020 at 21:55:11 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIF VS MICHAEL H BANKS

Case Summary

On 06/12/2002 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIF filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against MICHAEL H BANKS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRUCE MITCHELL, MALCOLM MACKEY and SAMANTHA JESSNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5591

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2002

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRUCE MITCHELL

MALCOLM MACKEY

SAMANTHA JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIF.

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Claimant

GRAHAM VAAGE & CISNEROS

Defendants and Respondents

BANKS MICHAEL H.

BERNADEAN A. HANSON TRUST

HANSON BERNADEAN

HANSON KENNETH E.

HANSON MARDENE V.

JONATHON FINANCIAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LEUNG TODD TAK SHING

LEUNG TODD T. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GRAHAM ARNOLD K. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Setting an Order to Show Cause Hearing in Depa...)

2/6/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Setting an Order to Show Cause Hearing in Depa...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Re Setting an Order to Show Cause Hearing in Depa...) of 02/06/2019

2/6/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Re Setting an Order to Show Cause Hearing in Depa...) of 02/06/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Setting an Order to Show Cause Hearing in Depa...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Setting an Order to Show Cause Hearing in Depa...) of 02/06/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2004
  • DocketOrder (REQUEST AND ORDER FOR RELEASE OF DEPOSIT ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2004
  • DocketOrder (FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2004
  • DocketDeclaration (of todd t. leung in support of the final order of condemnation and request and order for release of deposit; ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2004
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2004
  • DocketOrder (ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF THE COURT TO ACCEPT PAYMENT TO SATISFY JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2004
  • DocketDeclaration (OF TODD T. LEUNG IN SUPPORT OF THE REQUEST FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO ACCEPT PAYMENT AND ORDER THEREON ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2003
  • DocketJudgment (Judgment in Condemnation ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2002
  • DocketNotice (of first pre-trial conference ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2002
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2002
  • DocketOrder (FOR POSSESSION ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2002
  • DocketApplication-Miscellaneous (AND DECLARATION FOR ORDER FOR POSSESSION ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2002
  • DocketDeclaration (OF TODD T. LEUNG IN SUPPORT OF THE ORDER FOR POSSESSION ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2002
  • DocketNotice (OF DEPOSIT; SUMMARY OF THE BASIS FOR THE APPRAISAL ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2002
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2002
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The People of The State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2002
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The People of The State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2002
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BANKS MICHAEL R is a litigant

Latest cases where JONATHAN FINANCIAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAHAM ARNOLD K. ESQ.