This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2020 at 10:08:35 (UTC).

PELAEZ, ANDRES BERNABE - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 03/15/2001 PELAEZ, ANDRES BERNABE - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SWART, COLEMAN, LEVANAS, MICHAEL I. and GREEN, LESLEY C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8287

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SWART, COLEMAN

LEVANAS, MICHAEL I.

GREEN, LESLEY C.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

PELAEZ FATIMA

PELAEZ SOCORRO

PUBLIC GUARDIAN

PELAEZ MICHAEL

Not Classified By Court

PELAEZ ANDREAS

SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WHITESELL RALLS & STROH LAW OFFICES OF

AGUILAR ANN M. COUNTY COUNSEL

STROH HERBERT A.

SHAPIRO LEONA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Probate Investigator

4/4/2016: Proof of Service - Probate Investigator

Declaration and Order Re Fees For All Court Appointments

9/25/2014: Declaration and Order Re Fees For All Court Appointments

Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

5/14/2014: Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

Determination of Conservatee's Appropriate Level of Care

4/28/2014: Determination of Conservatee's Appropriate Level of Care

Minute Order - Conservatorship

4/22/2014: Minute Order - Conservatorship

Minute Order - Conservatorship

4/22/2014: Minute Order - Conservatorship

OTHER - PVP COUNSEL'S REPORT FOR DEVELOPMENTALLY DISABLED ADULTS

4/15/2014: OTHER - PVP COUNSEL'S REPORT FOR DEVELOPMENTALLY DISABLED ADULTS

Minute Order

3/28/2014: Minute Order

Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator

3/11/2014: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator

OTHER - PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF CO-CONSERVATOR

3/11/2014: OTHER - PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF CO-CONSERVATOR

Proof of Service - Probate Investigator

5/7/2009: Proof of Service - Probate Investigator

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2016
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, (Department, ST29), Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketReport - Court Investigator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketVoting Rights Restored

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketReport - Court Investigator (Signed 3/29/16. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (Filed by: Clerk )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • DocketDeclaration (Filed by: Clerk )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • DocketLetters (Filed by: Petitioner Issued To: Pelaez, Fatima, Petitioner Repres. By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • DocketDuties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook (Filed By: Pelaez, Fatima, Petitioner Repres. By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Conservator (NO BOND Filed by: Conservator Conservator: Pelaez, Fatima, Petitioner Repres. By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2001
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Counsel (Herbert A. Stroh, Esq. Filed by: Court )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2001
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Counsel (Filed by: Court )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2001
  • DocketProof of Service (Filed by: Clerk )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2001
  • DocketProof of Service (Filed by: Court )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2001
  • DocketOrder (Appointing Court Investigator )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2001
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Conservator of Person (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted After Trial-Uncontested LIMITED 1st Hearing Date: 04/27/2001 Repres. By: PELAEZ, SOCORRO, Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2001
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address (Filed by: Conservator Repres. By: PELAEZ, SOCORRO, Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2001
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info Sheet (Filed by: Conservator Repres. By: PELAEZ, SOCORRO, Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2001
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 (application is granted in whole applicant shall not make any payments Filed by: Petitioner in Pro Per Repres. By: PELAEZ, SOCORRO, Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2001
  • DocketDuties of Guardian (Filed by: Conservator Repres. By: PELAEZ, SOCORRO, Petitioner ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGUILAR ANN M. COUNTY COUNSEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPIRO LEONA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STROH, HERBERT A.