Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2021 at 20:47:38 (UTC).

PAUL BARRETT HERRIOTT VS ALICJA Z HERRIOTT

Case Summary

On 11/01/2004 PAUL BARRETT HERRIOTT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALICJA Z HERRIOTT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are NELSON, MAREN E., RIEGER, MARSHALL, ENDMAN, JAMES D., STEINBERG, MARJORIE, DREWRY, ANTHONY B., SCHNIDER, ROBERT A., LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT, GORDON, SCOTT M, BYRD, CHRISTINE, PELLMAN, AMY, NELSON, MAREN, ENDMAN, JAMES, PELLMAN, AMY M., SILVERMAN, B. SCOTT, JESSNER, SAMANTHA P., GORDON, SCOTT M., JUHAS, MARK A., WEINTRAUB, DEBRE KATZ, LIPNER, JOSEPH, STEINBERG, MARJORIE S. and KAUFMAN, SHELLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5787

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

NELSON, MAREN E.

RIEGER, MARSHALL

ENDMAN, JAMES D.

STEINBERG, MARJORIE

DREWRY, ANTHONY B.

SCHNIDER, ROBERT A.

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

GORDON, SCOTT M

BYRD, CHRISTINE

PELLMAN, AMY

NELSON, MAREN

ENDMAN, JAMES

PELLMAN, AMY M.

SILVERMAN, B. SCOTT

JESSNER, SAMANTHA P.

GORDON, SCOTT M.

JUHAS, MARK A.

WEINTRAUB, DEBRE KATZ

LIPNER, JOSEPH

STEINBERG, MARJORIE S.

KAUFMAN, SHELLEY

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Appellants and Respondents

HERRIOTT PAUL

HERRIOTT PAUL BARRETT

HERRIOTT ALICJA Z.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MANDELL SHELLY MAXINE

NACHSHIN ROBERT JAY

WASSERMAN LARRY EVAN

Respondent Attorneys

BRYAN SHARON ANN

MARTIN MICHAEL GARY

PRICHARD DONALD LEE

 

Court Documents

Response - Domestic Violence

12/8/2017: Response - Domestic Violence

Request - Judicial Notice

1/8/2018: Request - Judicial Notice

Minute Order

2/21/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/7/2018: Minute Order

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

2/8/2019: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

RFO/MTN - Attorney Fees - ...and judgment Nov 28, 2007 enforcement

2/8/2019: RFO/MTN - Attorney Fees - ...and judgment Nov 28, 2007 enforcement

Notice - Order of Case Reassignment

2/8/2019: Notice - Order of Case Reassignment

Miscellaneous - post judgmt rfo by resp

3/4/2019: Miscellaneous - post judgmt rfo by resp

Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - B287997

5/21/2019: Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - B287997

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - General Appeal

1/9/2020: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - General Appeal

Responsive Declaration

2/3/2020: Responsive Declaration

Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - Full Dismissal of All Appeal Issues

3/12/2020: Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - Full Dismissal of All Appeal Issues

Minute Order

7/29/2020: Minute Order

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - "U6"; Fee Waiver GRANTED 1/16/20; DCA Filing Fee Waived - Existing Order

9/24/2020: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - "U6"; Fee Waiver GRANTED 1/16/20; DCA Filing Fee Waived - Existing Order

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

9/30/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Proof of Service - "U6" DSGN

10/7/2020: Proof of Service - "U6" DSGN

Miscellaneous - Clerk Office of the Superior Court

11/24/2020: Miscellaneous - Clerk Office of the Superior Court

Proof of Service - Mail

12/29/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • Hearing04/06/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 83 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Request for Order - Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCourt Order for Post-Judgment Requests for Orders FAM 120

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Family Law (Other: Post-Death QDRO ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Notice of Rejection re proposed Qulified Domestic Relations Order ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous (QULIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER - MEMOORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ALICIA HERRIOTT SURVIVING SPOUSE ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B303595 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
705 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2004
  • DocketOrder (on pet's ex parte )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • DocketOSC - Order to Show Cause (EX PARTE )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • DocketDeclaration (of g. talbott )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • DocketDeclaration (of d. mcneil re notice )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2004
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 65, Steinberg, Marjorie S., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2004
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • DocketSummons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herriott, Paul ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • DocketMiscellaneous (family law case cover sheet - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herriott, Paul ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • DocketPetition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herriott, Paul ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herriott, Paul ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BD415787    Hearing Date: August 03, 2020    Dept: 42

Herriott v. Herriott, Case No. BD 415 787

Alicja Herriott applies for an order vacating this Court’s order of May 1, 2012, finding that Ms. Herriott was a vexatious litigant and requiring prefiling approval pursuant to Code Civ. Proc. §391.7.

A vexatious litigant subject to a prefiling order may file an application to vacate the prefiling order and to remove his or her name from the Judicial Council’s list of vexatious litigant subject to prefiling orders. Code Civ. Proc. §391.8. The application may be granted “upon a showing of a material change in the facts upon which the order was granted and that the ends of justice would be served by vacating the order.” Ms. Herriott’s Application fails to meet that standard.

In support of her Application, Ms. Herriott claims that she was a party to only 2 cases within the last 5 years:

That is not accurate. In fact, she filed 5 more cases:

  1. 18 TRRO 00999, Alicja Herriott v. Julianna Herriott, filed December 5, 2018 and dismissed for lack of prosecution;

  2. 18 TRRO 00994, Alicja Herriott v. Allie Bojorquez, filed December 3, 2018, and denied after hearing on December 21, 2018;

  3. BC 681 579, Alicja Herriott v. General Motors LLC, filed October 30, 2017 and dismissed with prejudice a year later on October 31, 2018;

  4. 18 STLC 06625, filed April 27, 2018, a parking appeal in which the violation was affirmed; and

  5. 18 STLC 06626, filed April 27, 2018 a parking appeal in which the violation was reversed.

In 4 of the 5 cases, she was in propria persona but did not obtain leave of the presiding judge to file. In one of them, Herriott v. General Motors LLC, she had counsel and prefiling permission was not required.

As for the 2 cases that she did identify in the Application, the dissolution case, BD 415 787, and the slip and fall case, BC 679 103, she made 4 filings without obtaining leave of court beforehand.

In sum, based on all the facts and circumstances and in the exercise of the Court’s discretion, the Application is DENIED and the vexatious litigant finding and prefiling order remain in full force and effect.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRYAN SHARON ANN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN MICHAEL G. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRICHARD DONALD LEE