This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2020 at 16:06:30 (UTC).

OCEAN PARK ESTATES, ET AL VS. BOAZ KALIN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/19/2002 OCEAN PARK ESTATES filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against BOAZ KALIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMONA G. SEE and WILLIAM G. WILLETT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3199

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMONA G. SEE

WILLIAM G. WILLETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCEAN PARK ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL SPECIALTY INSUR.

CHANG CHARLENE AN INDIVIDUAL

CHANG SIMON AN INDIVIDUAL

HWANG MING-TZE AN INDIVIDUAL

KALIN BOAZ

LIN SHUNG FONG AN INDIVIDUAL

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BREMER & WHYTE LLP

CHANG CHARLENE AN INDIVIDUAL

CHANG SIMON AN INDIVIDUAL

Cross Defendants

ACTION INSULATION

ADVANCED FIREPLACES INC.

ANAYA RICHARD DBA FRAM CONSTRUCTION

BEST IRON

BIRRESBORN JOHN DBA STARLITE ELECTRIC

BREMER & WHYTE LLP

CHEN RICH T. DBA T.C.PAINTING ROE #2

EDWARDS LAWRENCE EDWARDS CONST. ROE #4

GALVAN SALVADOR DBA CALTIA SHEET METAL

LIM PAUL DBA LIM CONSTRUCTION CO.

MATTUCCI PLUMBING FKA GUIDO MATTUCCI

PACIFIC COAST ROOFING

PROFESSIONAL BUILDING COMPONENTS INC.

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIORE RACOBS & POWERS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN

COX CASTLE AND NICHOLSON

DRISCOLL & REYNOLDS

MILAN & LARSEN

BRADY VORWERCK & RYDER

SAWYER ORR & SAWYER

Cross Defendant Attorneys

KOLOD WAGER & NOLAN

FRUCHTER E. LEONARD

MAXIE RHEINHEIMER STEPHENS & VREVICH

LAPIDUS RYAN D.

BROWNWOOD CHAZEN & CANNON

LIBERTUCCI LINDA M LAW OFFICES OF

CLEMENTS & KNOCK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2004
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (X-C DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJ. FILED 06-17-02--BY HWANY & LIN ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2004
  • DocketNotice of Hearing/Trial; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2004
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (AS TO X-C FILED BY S&W WATERPROOF. ON 04-21-04--DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJ. ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2004
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (AS TO X-C FILED ON 06-12-04 BY CHANG WITH PREJ. ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2003
  • DocketProof of Service (JOHN BIRRESBORN INVID.&DBA STARLITE ELECTRIC'S POS OF COURT CONFORMED ORDER DETERMINING SETTLEMENT TO BE IN GOOD FAITH ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2003
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department SBA9, Ramona G. See, Presiding; Court's Order to Show Cause (RE: DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE CASE) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2003
  • DocketOrder (DETERMINING SETTLEMENT TO BE IN GOOD FAITH SIGNED AND FILED ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2003
  • DocketStipulation and Order (VACATING DISMISSAL FOR AS TO X-DEFTS JOHN BIRRESBORN, IND DBA STARLITE ELECTRIC FOR LIMITED PURPOSES FILED. . ORDER IS SIGNED AND FILED.); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2003
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department SBA9, William G. Willett, Presiding; Court's Order to Show Cause (DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE CASE-SIMON CHANG CROSS-COMPLAINT.-HWANG CROSS-COMPLAINT.-S&W CROSS-COMPLAINT & CHANG X-C) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2003
  • DocketOrder (DETERMINING SETTLEMENT TO BE IN GOOD FAITH, AS TO CROSS-DEFT/ CROSS-PLTF JOE E. TEDDY. - ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLETT ); Filed by Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    Read MoreRead Less
137 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2002
  • DocketDeclaration (OCEAN PARK ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSO ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2002
  • DocketCross-Compl fld - Summons Issued (CHANG VS KALIN, HWANG ET AL DISMISSED 03-04-04 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2002
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed (SIMON CHANG & CHARLENE CHANG ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2002
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SHUNG FONG LIN SERVED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2002
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (ULTIMATE DIMENSION DEVELOPMENT NAMED IN PLACE AND IN STEAD OF DOE#51 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2002
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SIMON CHANG SERVED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2002
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (CHARLENE CHANG SERVED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2002
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BOAZ KALIN SERVED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2002
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed (MING-TZE HWANG AS AMINIST. OF ESTATE OF BOAZ KALIN ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2002
  • DocketComplaint Filed (DISMISSED 07-23-03--WITHOUT PREJ. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacific Coast Roofing Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL SPECIALTY LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, now known as AIG SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant