This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 05:14:00 (UTC).

NORMAN MINKOW ET AL VS TWO BRUDDAHS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/13/2006 NORMAN MINKOW filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TWO BRUDDAHS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3963

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MINKOW BRIAN

MINKOW NORMAN

MINKOW STEVEN

Defendants and Respondents

CHANG WILSON

NAKABAYASHI JOEL

TWO BRUDDAHS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AUGUST MARSHALL J. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

ALBRIGHT CLIFTON W. LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/22/2009: CIVIL DEPOSIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2009
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2007
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 38; Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for an Order; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2006
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2006
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2006
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2006
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2006
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2006
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2006
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2006
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Norman Minkow (Plaintiff); Steven Minkow (Plaintiff); Brian Minkow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2006
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Norman Minkow (Plaintiff); Steven Minkow (Plaintiff); Brian Minkow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2006
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2006
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2006
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2006
  • DocketOrd to Show Cause (Ntc to Appear); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2006
  • DocketOrd to Show Cause (Ntc to Appear); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2006
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2006
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. MONEY HAD AND RECEIVED; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2006
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Norman Minkow (Plaintiff); Steven Minkow (Plaintiff); Brian Minkow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TWO BRUDDAHS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALBRIGHT CLIFTON W.