This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2016 at 00:04:34 (UTC).

Nelida Lopez Vs Ernesto Andres Franco

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Nelida Lopez against Ernesto Andres Franco in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9469

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Veasey, Glenda

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lopez Nelida

Respondent

Franco Ernesto Andres

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2001
  • Notice-Entry-Judgment Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2001
  • Judgment Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2001
  • Notice-Hearing (AMENDED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2001
  • Request-Enter Default Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2001
  • Notice-Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2001
  • Notice-Entry-Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2001
  • Declaration-Serv Final Decl of Dis Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2001
  • Notice-Change of Address Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2001
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2001
  • Request-Enter Default Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Journal Converted from DOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Summons Filed by Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.